THE NORTH WALES POLICE AND COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PACT supports and develops projects, particularly those in which the Police are involved, which aim to improve the quality of life by reducing crime and the fear of crime in the communities of north Wales and educating young people about the consequences of crime. Young people's projects are also supported through our Crimebeat fund which PACT manages with the High Sheriffs of Clwyd and Gwynedd.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
- Wrexham
Governance
- 21 September 1998: Standard registration
- PACT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Ashley Rogers | Chair | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Peter Harlech Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Henry Fetherstonhaugh OBE LL | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STEPHEN THOMAS | Trustee | 26 July 2012 |
|
|||||
PAUL ASHLEY HINCHLIFFE | Trustee | 26 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA HUGHES DL | Trustee | 01 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
LADY JANET JONES JP DL | Trustee | 01 April 1990 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HINCHLIFFE | Trustee | 12 March 1990 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.76k | £150.50k | £186.96k | £244.16k | £140.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.85k | £163.77k | £143.58k | £178.34k | £155.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £51.20k | £79.90k | £1.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 February 2025 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN NORTH WALES A SAFER AND INCREASED QUALITY OF LIFE THROUGH THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND THE REDUCTION OF THE FEAR OF CRIME AND THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM CRIMINAL ACTS AND THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY INITIATIVES; AND (B) TO SECURE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO ALCOHOL, SOLVENT AND OTHER DRUG ABUSE
Area of benefit
NORTH WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Wales Police
Ffordd William Morgan
St. Asaph Business Park
St. Asaph
LL17 0HQ
- Phone:
- 01745588516
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window