THE ISABEL RAMSAY BROWN MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was established to help maintain the fabric of Little Whelnetham Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 03 December 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Rigby | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM TYNDALE CARDALE | Trustee | 08 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
ALIX BARABAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £4.00k | £4.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | £1.25k | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED IN THE WINCHESTER DISTRICT PROBATE REGISTRY ON 14TH AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF ST. MARY MAGDALENE LITTLE WHELNETHAM ( "THE CHURCH") IN THE DIOCESE OF IPSWICH AND ST. EDMUNDSBURY AND THE MONUMENTS FIXTURES FITTINGS STAINED GLASS FURNITURE ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND OF THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH AND OF THE ACQUISITION OF ADDITIONAL LAND FOR USE AS A CHURCHYARD FOR THE CHURCH (11) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF LITTLE WHELNETHAM TO PRESERVE REPAIR AND MAINTAIN IMPROVE BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT THE CHURCH AS A BUILDING OF HISTORIC IMPORTANCE OR ARCHITECTURAL VALUE IN THE EVENT OF THE CHURCH BEING DECLARED REDUNDANT BY A PASTORAL SCHEME MADE UNDER THE PASTORAL MEASURE 1983 (OR ANY STATUTORY MODIFICATION OR RE-ENACTMENT THEREOF) OR OTHERWISE CEASING TO BE USED REGULARLY FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP AND THE MONUMENTS FIXTURES FITTINGS STAINED GLASS FURNITURE ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO IT (111) THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITABLE TRUST WHICH IS NOT FOR THE TIME BEING REQUIRED FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSES TO OR FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST. MARY MAGDALENE LITTLE WHELNETHAM (1V) SUBJECT TO THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE CHARITABLE TRUST FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE SUFFOLK HISTORIC CHURCHES FUND.
Area of benefit
LITTLE WHELNETHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
LITTLE WHELNETHAM HALL
LITTLE WHELNETHAM
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP30 0DA
- Phone:
- 01284386305
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window