ALL HALLOWS PARISH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Church of England parish church providing worship opportunities, fellowship, Christian training, pastoral care, and community support in a lively multi-racial area of inner-city Bristol facing considerable challenges.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
Governance
- 15 March 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel James MacDougall Ford | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard George Vigars | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Angharad Vallejo Veiga | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tobias Giold | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Rebecca Ford | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Davey | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Garfield John Griffiths | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.97k | £53.97k | £59.54k | £66.06k | £47.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.19k | £49.75k | £34.89k | £91.03k | £50.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 April 2022 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 April 2022 | 169 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
COMMISSIONERS SCHEME DATED 31 OCTOBER 2000.
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL HALLOWS, EASTON, BRISTOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Hallows Church
Easton
BRISTOL
BS5 0HL
- Phone:
- 07756035718
- Email:
- susan.davey@r-pad.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window