CITY AND COUNTY NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH ASSOCIATION (LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote good citizenship and greater Public participation in the prevention and solution of crime and community safety issues, in order to improve the quality of life for all members in Leicester & Leicestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 04 November 1998: Standard registration
- LLSNWA (Working name)
- NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH LEICESTER & LEICESTERSHIRE SOUT (Working name)
- LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE SOUTH NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- LEICESTERSHIRE SOUTH AREA NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH NEEDHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRIS PAYNTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNDA EATON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD PAYNTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.18k | £4.86k | £4.33k | £5.37k | £17 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.71k | £4.24k | £4.71k | £3.89k | £1.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED 27 JULY 2001 AND 12 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME AND COMMUNITY SAFETY ISSUES, IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR ALL MEMBERS IN LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE.
Area of benefit
LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36B OXFORD ROAD
LEICESTER
LE2 1TN
- Phone:
- 01162700032
- Email:
- ccnwaleics@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window