BAHIA STREET TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bahia Street breaks cycles of poverty and violence through quality educational programmes for impoverished girls and young women living in the shantytowns of Salvador, Brazil
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ghana
- India
- Malawi
Governance
- 25 January 2000: Standard registration
- 27 May 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2015 | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £449 | £60 | £22 | £6 | £9 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.00k | £8.00k | £6.04k | £50 | £8.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 12 November 2019 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | 27 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2016 | 13 April 2017 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 22 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONGST YOUNG WOMEN AND GIRLS IN BAHIA, BRAZIL. 2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN WORLD POVERTY.
Area of benefit
BAHIA, BRAZIL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window