Accounts and annual returns THE SEWARD LODGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1073465
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 July 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 24 July 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 24 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 24 July 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 24 July 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 24 July 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 24 July 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 24 July 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 24 July 2005 13 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 July 2005 Not Required