SOUTHEND HOSPITAL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Southend Hospital Charitable Foundation fundraises for major projects at Southend University Hospital, part of Mid and South Essex NHS Foundation Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 18 December 1998: Standard registration
- SOUTHEND HOSPITAL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Working name)
- SOUTHEND HOSPITAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP AARON MILLER MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Percy Frederick Dedman | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Carr | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Emma Cox | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
EMMA Rowe | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE EDWIN SAMUEL LEWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN KEITH HARLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIGEL JAMES GAYNER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.45k | £162.55k | £161.12k | £305.38k | £401.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.99k | £178.65k | £177.41k | £154.94k | £503.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27TH AUGUST 1998, AMEND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 21ST OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND AMENITIES AT SOUTHEND HOSPITAL, OR ANY BRANCH THEREOF WHICH WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE PROVIDED BY THE AUTHORITY CHARGED WITH THE RESPONSIBILITY OF MANAGING THE HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEPARTMENT OF FUNDRAISING
SOUTHEND UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
PRITTLEWELL CHASE
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
ESSEX
SS0 0RY
- Phone:
- 01702385337
- Email:
- southendhospitalcf@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window