BRAMBLE BEARS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PLAYGROUP FOR CHILDREN AGED 2 TO 5 YEARS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- ASHWELLTHORPE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Trevor Charles lay | Chair | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Moore | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin David Bugg | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael jayne Bugg | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bianca Rose Moller | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.33k | £53.50k | £50.91k | £66.87k | £64.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.43k | £54.25k | £56.05k | £53.79k | £58.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.88k | £3.77k | N/A | £10.00k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/09/1998 AS AMENDED ON 17/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE IN ASHWELLTHORPE VILLAGE A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE ASHWELLTHORPE, NR NORWICH NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Village Hall
57-59 The Street
Ashwellthorpe
NORWICH
NR16 1AA
- Phone:
- 07789055211
- Email:
- bbsupervisor01@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window