ALPINGTON AND YELVERTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashleigh Lister | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kasie Natasha Balchin | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Scott | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Heelas | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Sneddon | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Allman | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laila Goodbody | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.09k | £45.70k | £47.49k | £64.04k | £54.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.80k | £50.04k | £55.22k | £60.65k | £60.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £38.62k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 14TH SEPTEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE IN ALPINGTON AND YELVERTON A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
APLINGTON AND YELVERTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alpington & Yelverton Village Hall
Church Road
Alpington
NR14 7NS
- Phone:
- 07585873508
- Email:
- alpingtonpreschool@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window