SPEKE/GARSTON YOUNG PERSONS INTERNET DROP-IN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 12 October 1998: Standard registration
- INTER CHILL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN IRESTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
S BUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEANNA MCINYREE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN SILVA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 820 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 820 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1185 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1185 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1550 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1550 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JULY 1998 AS AMENDED 8 OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE, BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 25, PARTICULARLY THOSE LIVING IN THE SPEKE/GARSTON AREA OF MERSEYSIDE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO THEIR FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window