FIRST TOUCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
First Touch is concerned with the relief, care and treatment of premature and sick new babies in the neonatal unit at St George Hospital, by providing and assisting in the provision of specialist equipment and improved amenities and facilities, and to support and assist the families of such babies who are or who have been on the unit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 19 November 1998: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF N.N.U AT ST. GEORGES (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF NNU AT ST GEORGES (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE NEO- NATAL UNIT AT ST. GEORGES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA EASTWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Natalie Ann Daly | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Nestor | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ADAM GARY NORGETT | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benedict Kiran Donald Shaw | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jane Hunter | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Joanne O'Grady | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Abramson | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sijo Francis | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KIM CADDY | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ACHIM HERBERT VOGT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.56k | £193.22k | £292.55k | £197.70k | £214.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.98k | £193.61k | £237.81k | £230.86k | £143.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 08/09/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18/06/2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF, CARE AND TREATMENT OF PREMATURE AND SICK NEWBORN BABIES IN THE NEO-NATAL UNIT AT ST. GEORGES HOSPITAL, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT AND IMPROVING AMENITIES AND FACILITIES, SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING THE FAMILIES OF SUCH BABIES WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN PATIENTS ON THE UNIT.
Area of benefit
TOOTING
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. GEORGES HOSPITAL
BLACKSHAW ROAD
LONDON
SW17 0QT
- Phone:
- 02089440131
- Email:
- info@first-touch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window