CROYDON COLORECTAL CANCER CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide funds for the design and build of a modern colorectal cancer early diagnosis unit, at Mayday University Hospital, Croydon, Surrey, CR7 7YE. Additionally, providing funds for purchase of the medical equipment to be installed in the new unit. In addition , funds will be made available for specified medical research .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Croydon
Governance
- 14 January 1999: Standard registration
- 15 July 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.88k | £75 | £296 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.81k | £931.00k | £1.69k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | 22 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1998, AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14TH DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY: 1. THE PROVISION OF A COLORECTAL CANCER UNIT AT MAYDAY UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL FOR THE TREATMENT OF BOWEL CANCER AND RELATED DISEASES 2. THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF BOWEL CANCER AND RELATED DISEASES AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
CROYDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window