ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION DEWSBURY BATLEY AND BIRSTALL BRANCH
Charity number: 1071950
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help all pepole of the armed forces connected to the Royal Navy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Total income: £264
Total expenditure: £521
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Kirklees
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 October 1998: Standard registration
- 22 December 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.33k | £1.27k | £652 | £264 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.59k | £1.14k | £774 | £521 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 08 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 08 February 2008 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 06 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 06 July 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SUPPLEMENTAL ROYAL CHARTER AND RULES AND BYE LAWS OF THE RNA (266982)
Charitable objects
AS PER RNA (266982)
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DEWSBURY,BATLEY & BIRSTALL, WEST YORKSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window