Accounts and annual returns DAVID GOODMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1073195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 07 January 2025 337 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 25 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 June 2021 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 June 2021 145 days late Download Open in new window