THE GILCHRIST UNIT SUPPORTERS' TRUST ( KNOWN AS THE G.U.S. TRUST)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The protection and preservation of health of women, babies, families and individuals in Suffolk and South Norfolk by providing and assisting in the provision of services, facilities, equipment and items at and from the Gilchrist building in Eye, Suffolk, which may include services, facilities, equipment and items relating to post-natal care, with the object of improving health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 08 June 1999: Standard registration
- 09 October 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE G.U.S. TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 07 March 2017 | 396 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 19 May 2015 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 04 February 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH JULY 1998, AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 18TH MAY 1999
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF WOMEN, BABIES, FAMILIES AND INDIVIDUALS IN SUFFOLK AND SOUTH NORFOLK BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND ITEMS AT AND FROM THE GILCHRIST BUILDING IN EYE, SUFFOLK, WHICH MAY INCLUDE SERVICES, FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND ITEMS RELATING TO POST-NATAL CARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE HEALTH OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY OF SUFFOLK AND SOUTH NORFOLK.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK AND SOUTH NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window