SETPOINT LONDON EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public education within science, technology and the environment for young people of statutory school age in the East London Boroughs and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 December 1998: Standard registration
- SATRO NORTH LONDON (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juliet Can | Chair | 26 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Mary Ann Palmer | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Mendez | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten King | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosanne Amie Crowther | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA LAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.38k | £21.27k | £52.05k | £39.70k | £63.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.43k | £40.91k | £39.50k | £52.08k | £59.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.48k | £25.93k | £622 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 September 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 September 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION WITHIN SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY AND THE ENVIRONMENT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE OF STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE IN THE NORTH LONDON BOROUGHS AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
NORTH LONDON BOROUGHS AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Soanes Centre
Tower Hamlets Cemetery Park
Southern Grove
London
E3 4PX
- Phone:
- 02082526644
- Email:
- dimuthu@soanescentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window