FAMILY CONTACT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Represent, safeguard and promote the welfare of Children involved in Family Court Proceedings. Provide Supported and Supervised Contact services across South Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 29 March 1999: Standard registration
- 4CS (Working name)
- THE CHILDREN'S COMMUNITY CONTACT CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Lewis | Chair | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Emmy Todd | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael O'Toole | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Alexander | Trustee | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.69k | £72.05k | £79.94k | £31.65k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.65k | £80.96k | £69.48k | £37.86k | £15.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £47.72k | £46.36k | £75.61k | £31.65k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 April 2025 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 April 2025 | 446 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 April 2025 | 446 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 FEBRUARY 1999 as amended on 05 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR AMONG CHILDREN RESIDENT IN CARDIFF AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WITHIN SOUTH EAST WALES CAUSED BY THE BREAK-UP OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A CENTRE AND FACILITIES WHEREBY SUCH CHILDREN CAN MORE READILY ENJOY THE COMPANY AND LOVE OF THEIR NON-RESIDENT PARENT AND OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
CARDIFF AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITHIN SOUTH EAST WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 FLORENTIA STREET
CARDIFF
CF24 4PF
- Phone:
- 02922402665
- Email:
- info@family-contact.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window