Trustees LOTHERSDALE VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity number: 1097674

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN paul COHEN | Chair | 31 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Malcolm Frederick Willetts | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN PAUL COHEN | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Hart | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev GILLIAN LOUISE HALL | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE MARGARET GOTT | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ARTHUR SMITH | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
KENDAL RICHARD GOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.