Accounts and annual returns BIRMINGHAM CHINESE YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1072594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 February 2025 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 February 2025 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 April 2023 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required