ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION GLOUCESTER BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The elected almoner visits anyone who the branch feels may need help irrespective of where they are, home or hospital and has individual authority to do anything needed to eleviate the problem.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 06 October 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Stoyles | Chair | 27 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hanley | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROGER REA | Trustee | 28 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £877 | £12.85k | £17.37k | £14.75k | £362 | |
|
Total expenditure | £386 | £261 | £30.79k | £11.21k | £1.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2022 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SUPPLEMENTAL ROYAL CHARTER AND RULES AND BYE LAWS OF THE RNA (266982)
Charitable objects
AS PER RNA (266982)
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTER, GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Whaddon Road
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL52 5NF
- Phone:
- 07354 755813
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window