READING ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meetings held monthly (Sep - Jun) with guest speaker. Separate Beginner section for all ages (talk, observing and advice). Regular observing sessions from a dark site. Visits arranged to sites of astronomical interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Reading
- Wokingham
Governance
- 05 July 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN TALBOT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GERALD WILLIAM BOND | Trustee | 30 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNE FRANCES CHADWICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS V I L CONEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER PATRICK MENMUIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.09k | £1.38k | £1.83k | £1.93k | £1.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.24k | £931 | £2.13k | £2.15k | £3.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 15 April 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 19 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 APRIL 1999.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ITS MEMBERS AND THE PUBLIC IN THE SCIENCE OF ASTRONOMY AND SPACE RESEARCH, BY CO-OPERATION AND INTERCOMMUNICATION OF IDEAS AND KNOWLEDGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 BARRETTS WAY
SUTTON COURTENAY
ABINGDON
OX14 4DD
- Phone:
- 01235 848162
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window