Financial history PLAY LANE MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1071915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £129 £124 £4.20k £944 £657
Total expenditure £335 £305 £2.48k £3.10k £245
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A