Trustees THE MILFORD MILLENNIUM HALL AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1075243

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Mary Bagnall | Chair | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Parry | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Fraser | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HAYDN ELLIS | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Suzette Silander | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Celia Ruth Jobey Jones | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mike Walker | Trustee | 15 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Henry Ware-Lane | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT THOMAS BISHOP | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|||||
OLIVER HUGH WHITLOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.