THE CLOWNS' GALLERY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A museum/gallery of clown history, showing items such as posters, clothing, books,videos,props and the oldest clown egg collection in the world. Some eggs dating back to the 1940s. All clowns that belong to Clown International ( the oldest clown organisation in the world) have their face copied on our great egg collection.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 July 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Thom | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Davies | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
David William Girt | Trustee | 03 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Antony Eldridge | Trustee | 01 June 2004 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW NEVILLE FAINT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN SOLITY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £218 | £110 | £965 | £1.16k | £556 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £1.17k | £1.10k | £1.18k | £1.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH MARCH 1997 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 6TH JULY 1999
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE ACQUIRING HOUSING AND CONSERVING OF ARCHIVE MATERIAL RELATING TO THE ART OF CLOWNING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 SHERWOOD ROAD
ILFORD
IG6 1BL
- Phone:
- 02085503021
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window