Financial history DARUL KHIDMAH WAL FALAH, UK

Charity number: 1073506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/09/2019 22/09/2020 22/09/2021 22/09/2022 22/09/2023
Total gross income £16.21k £17.53k £18.34k £18.44k £19.61k
Total expenditure £15.00k £16.00k £20.75k £19.00k £19.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A