DARUL KHIDMAH WAL FALAH, UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping the poor, needy and the sick people. Arrange non formal education for the poverty stricken. Health facilities for the sick slum dwellers in Bangladesh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 26 January 1999: Standard registration
- DKWF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR GHULAM SARWAR | Chair |
|
||||||
SULTANA NASREEN SARWAR MA | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr MUHAMMED KAMRUL HASAN PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR FARUQ NURUL AREFIN MBBS | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr ZAHIRUL HUQ MBCHB MRCS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/09/2019 | 22/09/2020 | 22/09/2021 | 22/09/2022 | 22/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.21k | £17.53k | £18.34k | £18.44k | £19.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.00k | £16.00k | £20.75k | £19.00k | £19.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 September 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 September 2022 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 September 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 September 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 September 2019 | 25 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
(1) TO HELP THE POOR, THE NEEDY AND THE SICK PEOPLE (11) THE ADVANCEMENT OF GENERAL, VOCATIONAL AND ISLAMIC RELIGIOUS EDUCATION (111) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM ACCORDING TO THE TEACHINGS OF THE QUR'AN AND THE SUNNAH OF PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE BE UPON HIM).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
152 Drayton Park
London
N5 1LX
- Phone:
- 02037194212
- Email:
- gs_dkwf@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window