THE FERNDOWN & DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides educational , recreational and social activities in the Ferndown area of Dorset for those no longer in full-time employment. Currently there about 90 groups. Most activities are held from mid-September until the end of May. The subscription is £40 for our accounting year. We have approximately 560 members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
71 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 07 January 1999: Standard registration
- Ferndown U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josephine Anne Hutton | Chair | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL LAMB | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ELLIS | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Gwen Ward | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
VALARIE ANN TUCKER | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ansuya Patel | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Margaret Gill | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Cresswell | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivian Lee Dedman | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Margaret Larcombe | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thelma Evelyn Poole | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joan Marshall Brearley | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Gill | Trustee | 15 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
GLYN HOLDEN BOSANKO | Trustee | 15 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2020 | 30/05/2021 | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2023 | 30/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.47k | £25.52k | £42.85k | £55.39k | £73.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.97k | £17.69k | £56.99k | £56.65k | £71.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED 12 DECEMBER 2000 as amended on 09 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN FERNDOWN AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE
Area of benefit
FERNDOWN AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Aldridge Road
FERNDOWN
Dorset
BH22 8LT
- Phone:
- 01202 855560
- Email:
- ferndownu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window