Accounts and annual returns CURO PLACES LIMITED

Charity Number: 1074574
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 28 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 16 September 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 06 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 06 August 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 08 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 24 August 2012 On Time