Governing document CURO PLACES LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/06/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/02/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/12/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/05/2013
Charitable objects
3.1.1 THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF HOUSING (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO SOCIAL HOUSING) AND ANY OTHER AMENITIES, FACILITIES AND SERVICES CONNECTED WITH OR INCIDENTAL TO THE PROVISION OF HOUSING IN EACH CASE FOR RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, THE AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY), HANDICAPPED, AND CHRONICALLY SICK. 3.1.2 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, THE AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED AND CHRONICALLY SICK WHO ARE RESIDENTS OF THE CHARITY, OR DEPENDANTS OF SUCH RESIDENTS LIVING WITH SUCH RESIDENTS OR RESIDENTS WITHIN THE COMMUNITIES IN WHICH THE CHARITY OPERATES, PROVIDED THAT THEY HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. 3.1.3 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.