Accounts and annual returns BUDDHIST EDUCATION FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1073008
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2008 09 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 09 October 2008 223 days late
Annual return 30 April 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2006 10 August 2007 163 days late