BUDDHIST EDUCATION FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 December 1998: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | 09 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | 09 October 2008 | 223 days late | |
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | 10 August 2007 | 163 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25TH NOVEMBER 1996, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 22ND NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PHILOSOPHIES OF BUDDHISM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window