Accounts and annual returns FIVE ELEMENT SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1074991
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2007 01 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 01 May 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2006 05 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 24 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2005 24 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 24 February 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2004 08 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 08 November 2004 On Time