FIVE ELEMENT SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 April 1999: Standard registration
- 06 May 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SCHOOL OF FIVE ELEMENT ACUPUNCTURE ; SOFEA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | 31/07/2005 | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £335.36k | £293.63k | £230.42k | £117.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £304.23k | £272.19k | £229.26k | £196.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 01 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 01 May 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 05 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 24 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 24 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 24 February 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 08 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | 08 November 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JULY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY PROMOTING THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF THE BRANCH OF TRADITIONAL CHINESE ACUPUNCTURE KNOWN AS FIVE ELEMENT ACUPUNCTURE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window