Aldborough and Thurgarton Village Care

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Care provides support to people living in Aldborough, Norfolk and surrounding villages. It provides a weekly lunch and a volunteer driving service for those (mainly elderly)who cannot get to doctor or hospital appointments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 09 November 1999: Standard registration
- Aldborough and Thurgarton Village Care (Working name)
- VILLAGE CARE (Working name)
- ALDBOROUGH VILLAGE CARE SCHEME (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Good | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Maguire | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Hooker | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE HAYTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.30k | £1.75k | £4.17k | £7.17k | £6.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.53k | £1.80k | £5.38k | £6.55k | £8.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 21 APRIL 1999 NULL AS AMENDED ON 09 NOV 2022 as amended on 09 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE WELFARE AND WELLBEING OF PERSONS IN NEED WHOSE PLACE OF RESIDENCE IS WITHIN THE PARISH OF ALDBOROUGH AND THURGARTON OR THE SURROUNDING AREA IN ANY WAY WHICH IS DEEMED CHARITABLE. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS DOCUMENT THE SURROUNDING AREA SHALL MEAN WITHIN 5 MILES OF ALDBOROUGH VILLAGE SIGN ON THE VILLAGE GREEN.
Area of benefit
ALDBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Old School Cottage
Aldborough
NORWICH
NR11 7NR
- Phone:
- 01263768033
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window