MOUNT ALVERNIA HOSPITAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hospital was sold to BMI on 23/05/05. The charitable company has ceased trading and will be closed and the process of merging the charity under the FMDM Charity will shortly begin.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 December 1998: Standard registration
- 20 October 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/01/2007 | 31/01/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.83m | £11.99m | £34.98k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.80m | £6.50m | £22.35k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2009 | 23 June 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | 21 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2007 | 19 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2007 | 16 May 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 31 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 02 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 18 August 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 18 August 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 3RD NOVEMBER 1998 AND SEALED ORDER DATED 7 JULY 2000 (S26).
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE HOSPITALS AND MEDICAL CENTRES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF PATIENTS (B) TO SERVE THE SICK AND THE DYING AND TO CARE FOR THE PHYSICAL, SPIRITUAL AND EMOTIONAL NEEDS OF PATIENTS (C) TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CONGREGATION OF FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF THE DIVINE MOTHERHOOD AS DECLARED IN A TRUST DEED DATED 1 DECEMBER 1963 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME DATED 31 OCTOBER 1997 (D) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THE SCOPE OF THE OBJECTS DEFINED IN CLAUSE 2 OF THE TRUST DEED DATED 1 DECEMBER 1963 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME DATED 31 OCTOBER 1997 AS THE MAIN BOARD SHALL WITH THE CONSENT OF THE SUPERIOR DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window