EAST PECKHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the charity are to manage the affairs of the village hall in East Peckham for the benefit of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £8,063 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 10 May 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Esmond White | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Leslie Wing | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MALCOLM BRODIE | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD ALBERT PRIES | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES CATT | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY BEATTIE | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY ROPER | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.34k | £24.23k | £45.54k | £47.38k | £46.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.45k | £24.40k | £32.00k | £55.09k | £46.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.19k | £10.00k | £8.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 28 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 28 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 15TH OCTOBER 1998, SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 11TH APRIL 1999.
Charitable objects
TO CARRY OUT FUND RAISING ACTIVITIES IN ORDER TO BUILD AND RUN A NEW VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF EAST PECKHAM AND THE NEIGHBORHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
EAST PECKHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 Pound Road
East Peckham
TONBRIDGE
East Peckham
TONBRIDGE
Kent
- Phone:
- 01622872391
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window