ST PATRICK'S FOUNDATION (SOUTHAMPTON)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assists with the maintenance, refurbishment and restoration of Christian church buildings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Southampton City
Governance
- 14 December 1998: Standard registration
- 14 February 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £561 | £709 | £697 | £93 | £16 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £15 | £730 | £3.05k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 27 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 14 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 30 September 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 13 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 9TH SEPTEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15TH NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE RESTORATION, REFURBISHMENT, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE AND GENERAL UPKEEP OF CHRISTIAN CHURCH BUILDINGS TOGETHER WITH ANCILLARY BUILDINGS INCLUDING SCHOOLS, HALLS, AND DWELLINGS LOCATED WITHIN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DEANERY OF SOUTHAMPTON. ANY OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SOUTHAMPTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window