THE ORCHARD MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Overseeing the maintenance of the Orchard Millennium Green for the benefit of the Buckfastleigh Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 03 November 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Hayman | Chair | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Prior | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LACEY | Trustee | 30 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher England | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Val Browning | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.69k | £1.63k | £2.45k | £2.33k | £4.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.15k | £1.63k | £2.66k | £1.92k | £5.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 May 2024 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO THE PROVISION OF THE PROPERTY AND SHALL ACCORDINGLY HOLD ANY PROPERTY TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS "THE ORCHARD MILLENNIUM GREEN " FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.IN PRACTICE IN BUCKFASTLEIGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Orchard Millennium Green
Station Road
Buckfastleigh
Devon
TQ11 0BZ
- Phone:
- 07544375108
- Email:
- ahayman729@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window