THE MAERDY ARCHIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Maerdy Archive exists to promote the collecting of material i.e. photographs, written material and some artifacts on the past and present of the town of Maerdy, Rhondda. We have to date numerous photographs of the village and of the people who lived there in the past. All our collection is open to anybody who seeks information on the history of Maerdy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 16 December 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Kelvin Dorrington | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Wilson | Trustee | 14 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Royston Jones | Trustee | 19 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DAVID CYRIL OWEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
VALERIE THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.93k | £5.28k | £927 | £1.13k | £615 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.72k | £5.38k | £887 | £1.69k | £549 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH MAY 1998 AMENDED 7TH DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY OF MAERDY
Area of benefit
MAERDY
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 OAKLAND TERRACE
FERNDALE
CF43 4UD
- Phone:
- 01443732073
- Email:
- davidowen2001@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window