Financial history KESTREL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1073298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £29.52k £14.42k £36.39k £47.01k £99.65k
Total expenditure £33.07k £16.27k £8.93k £46.07k £67.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k N/A N/A N/A £13.50k