THE FRAZER NASH ARCHIVES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Frazer Nash Archives was founded by John Aldington, past managing director of AFN, to ensure preservation of the history of the Frazer Nash marque. Frazer Nash owners and enthusiasts, automobile engineering historians and those with a general interest in the development of an innovative, chain-driven cyclecar into a famous, competitive marque, should find the Archives of absorbing interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 December 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Louis Philip Hunt | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clive Godsell | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mellors | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew William Vincent | Trustee | 10 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE MARY BUNTING | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHESTER MARSH | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER LIVESEY | Trustee | 01 May 2008 |
|
|
||||
ROGER SPENCER RICHMOND | Trustee | 01 January 2006 |
|
|
||||
WINSTON JOHN TEAGUE | Trustee | 01 January 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.68k | £28.80k | £23.13k | £29.46k | £28.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.99k | £28.44k | £14.90k | £17.34k | £24.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 January 2022 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
ADVANCE OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF MOTOR SPORTS CARS AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) OF THE FRAZER NASH MARQUE AND TO FURTHER THE STUDY AND UNDERSTANDING OF MECHANICAL SCIENCE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO SPECIALIST LOW VOLUME MOTOR CAR MANUFACTURE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Warrener
Warren Row
READING
RG10 8QS
- Phone:
- 07796178705
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window