ORGANISATION FOR RESEARCH ON EWELAND (ORE UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ORE UK works to relieve poverty and promote development among people from West Africa and other BME groups in London and Africa through research. We promote health, education and culture of Eweland in the UK through lectures, publications and traditional events. We run training in personal development and employment for young people and families. We raise awareness about environmental issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Benin
- Ghana
- Togo
Governance
- 16 August 1999: Standard registration
- ORE (UK) (Working name)
- ORGANISATION FOR RESEARCH ON EWELAND UNITED KINGDOM (ORE UK) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr AMBROSE TOGOBO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Yao Setordzie Togobo | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Kwabla Kunutsor | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL AWUDE-KODZO | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
REV ALLAN TORKORNOO | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Bliss Bill Kodzo AYIVOR | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
GODWIN SABAH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £0 | £30 | £40 | £40 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8 | £8 | £20 | £73 | £70 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH JULY 1998
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTIVES ARE TO PROMOTE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNITY CENTRE OF SOUTH LONDON
2-4 RAVENSTONE STREET
LONDON
SW12 9SS
- Phone:
- 02085584171
- Email:
- oreuk@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window