Financial history COPING WITH CHAOS (DORSET)

Charity number: 1076937
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £38.12k £83.68k £98.57k £141.34k £166.03k
Total expenditure £36.67k £66.85k £103.28k £150.84k £103.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A