READING COMMUNITY WELFARE RIGHTS UNIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Specialist Advice on Welfare Benefits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £84,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £86,379 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Wokingham
Governance
- 08 March 1999: Standard registration
- Reading Welfare Rights (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER GRAHAM KAYES | Chair | 07 December 2006 |
|
|||||
Brendan McLean | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Ann Boyt | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Meri O'Connell | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Margaret Suen McEwan | Trustee | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jackalyn Lesley Hughes | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Kim Owen | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA THOMAS | Trustee | 28 September 2012 |
|
|||||
MOHAMMED AYUB | Trustee | 28 September 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.26k | £130.04k | £135.75k | £139.83k | £177.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.99k | £119.86k | £139.30k | £132.04k | £177.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £79.00k | £79.00k | £79.00k | £79.44k | £84.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.16k | N/A | £500 | £86.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 SEPTEMBER 1998 as amended on 11 Feb 2022 as amended on 20 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS 2) THE PROMOTION OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POPULATION OF GREATER READING
Area of benefit
GREATER READING
Contact information
- Address:
-
135 Cardiff Road
Reading
RG1 8JF
- Phone:
- 01189551070
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window