Accounts and annual returns GOLDEN BUDDHA CENTRE

Charity number: 1072818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 04 April 2024 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 04 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 22 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required