THE LOWER MOSS WOOD EDUCATIONAL NATURE RESERVE AND WILD LIFE HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lower Moss Wood is an educational nature reserve and wildlife hospital . It provides a place for schools, disabled visitors, environmental groups and others to come and learn about conservation and the environment. The wildlife hospital takes in any orphaned, sick or injured wild animal or bird for care. Lower Moss Wood is also a private nature reserve.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Stockport
- Trafford
Governance
- 15 November 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Norton | Chair | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Pople | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Boag-Munroe | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.53k | £85.76k | £110.16k | £101.03k | £78.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.34k | £84.81k | £104.62k | £149.50k | £144.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 November 2020 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 November 2020 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 SEPTEMBER 1999 as amended on 09 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, BY THE PROVISION OF A FACILITY AIMED AT PRE-SCHOOL, PRIMARY, SECONDARY AND FURTHER EDUCATION LEVELS, TO TEACH AND PROVIDE INFORMATION ON WILDLIFE AND CONSERVATION ISSUES AND ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION. 2. TO PROVIDE A FACILITY FOR THE RECEPTION OF INJURED, SICK AND ORPHANED ANIMALS, WILD BIRDS AND BIRDS OF ANY SPECIES, AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF AND TO PROVIDE TREATMENT FOR THESES ANIMALS AND BIRDS UNTIL THEIR EVENTUAL RELEASE BACK INTO THE WILD OR OTHERWISE. 3. TO CONSERVE AND PROTECT THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT TO ENSURE SURVIVAL OF RARE AND ENDANGERED SPECIES OF BOTH PLANTS AND ANIMALS OF THE AREA KNOWN AS THE LOWER MOSS WOOD NATURE RESERVE
Area of benefit
THE AREA KNOWN AS THE LOWER MOSS WOOD NATURE RESERVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCHOOL LANE
OLLERTON
KNUTSFORD
WA16 8SJ
- Phone:
- 01565755082
- Email:
- info@lowermosswood.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window