Financial history QUEEN STREET HERITAGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1076186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.17k £14.81k £31.93k £5.01k £11.96k
Total expenditure £2.96k £4.34k £23.21k £13.01k £8.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £15.17k N/A N/A