Financial history ACT ON ENERGY

Charity Number: 1075679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £587.99k £934.01k £3.25m £4.35m £4.68m
Total expenditure £570.67k £778.81k £2.69m £4.25m £4.24m
Income from government contracts N/A £61.79k £1.22m £3.02m £542.11k
Income from government grants £483.10k £805.01k £696.11k £970.92k £175.63k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £1.19m £1.39m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £586.78k £924.88k £3.23m £3.15m £3.28m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.21k £180 £39 £1.19k £8.82k
Income - Other £0 £8.95k £19.67k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £570.67k £777.32k £2.69m £4.25m £4.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.49k £0 £0 £22.60k