Financial history EAST SUSSEX BACH CHOIR

Charity number: 1084724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £33.57k £13.58k £9.83k £36.17k £28.32k
Total expenditure £31.67k £10.98k £6.52k £38.81k £28.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £550 £350 N/A £600 N/A