Financial history HARLOW AND DISTRICT CHINESE COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1079262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.26k £12.43k £14.78k £13.39k £9.33k
Total expenditure £18.28k £13.17k £37.29k £16.20k £15.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A